MI HB5043 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-17 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Mental health; other; use of mediation as a first step in dispute resolution; allow. Amends secs. 100b & 772 of 1974 PA 258 (MCL 330.1100b & 330.1772); adds sec. 206a & repeals sec. 788 of 1974 PA 258 (MCL 330.1788).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental health; other; use of mediation as a first step in dispute resolution; allow. Amends secs. 100b & 772 of 1974 PA 258 (MCL 330.1100b & 330.1772); adds sec. 206a & repeals sec. 788 of 1974 PA 258 (MCL 330.1788).

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-17HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means
2019-10-10HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 10/10/2019
2019-10-08HouseReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2019-10-08HouseRead A First Time
2019-10-08HouseIntroduced By Representative Hank Vaupel

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback