MI HB5034 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-12 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-12 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Individual income tax; retirement or pension benefits; limitations and restrictions on retirement income deduction for a surviving spouse; clarify. Amends sec. 30 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.30).
Title
Individual income tax; retirement or pension benefits; limitations and restrictions on retirement income deduction for a surviving spouse; clarify. Amends sec. 30 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.30).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 51 (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 51 (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2018-02-07 | House | Transmitted |
2018-02-07 | House | Title Amended |
2018-02-07 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 51 Yeas 105 Nays 2 |
2018-02-07 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-02-06 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-02-06 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2018-02-06 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-01-24 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2017-09-28 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/27/2017 |
2017-09-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2017-09-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-09-27 | House | Introduced By Representative Aaron Miller |
Subjects
Individual income tax: exemptions
Individual income tax: income
Individual income tax: retirement or pension benefits
Retirement: other
Individual income tax: income
Individual income tax: retirement or pension benefits
Retirement: other