MI HB5032 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-13 - Referred To Committee On Housing And Human Services
Pending: Senate Housing And Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-13 - Referred To Committee On Housing And Human Services
Pending: Senate Housing And Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Housing: housing development authority; sales price limit of the average purchase price; modify. Amends sec. 44 of 1966 PA 346 (MCL 125.1444).
Title
Housing: housing development authority; sales price limit of the average purchase price; modify. Amends sec. 44 of 1966 PA 346 (MCL 125.1444).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 159 (Y: 60 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Housing And Human Services |
2024-06-12 | House | Transmitted |
2024-06-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 159 Yeas 60 Nays 48 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2024-06-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2024-06-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2024-06-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2024-04-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2024-04-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2023-09-26 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/20/2023 |
2023-09-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Economic Development And Small Business |
2023-09-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-09-20 | House | Introduced By Representative Will Snyder |