MI HB5024 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-28 - Assigned Pa 350'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-28 - Assigned Pa 350'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; intoxication or impairment; impaired driving safety commission; create. Creates & repeals new act.
Title
Crimes; intoxication or impairment; impaired driving safety commission; create. Creates & repeals new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 689 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-11-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 169 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 169 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-28 | House | Assigned Pa 350'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-12-28 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/21/2016 @ 1:20 Pm |
2016-12-28 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/21/2016 @ 10:54 Am |
2016-12-13 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/9/2016 @ 2:50 Pm |
2016-12-07 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2016-12-07 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 689 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-12-06 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) |
2016-12-06 | Senate | Amendment(s) Concurred In |
2016-12-06 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2016-04-26 | House | Transmitted |
2016-04-26 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 169 Yeas 107 Nays 1 |
2016-04-26 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-04-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-04-21 | House | Substitute H-1 Not Adopted |
2016-04-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-04-21 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted And Amended |
2016-03-01 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-03-01 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2015-10-28 | House | Printed Bill Filed 10/28/2015 |
2015-10-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2015-10-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-10-27 | House | Introduced By Representative Peter Lucido |
Subjects
Controlled substances: use
Crimes: intoxication or impairment
Safety: other
Traffic control: violations
Crimes: intoxication or impairment
Safety: other
Traffic control: violations