MI HB5017 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on May 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - Discharge Committee Defeated
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - Discharge Committee Defeated
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; other; assessments on certain rental transactions; establish. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5018'09
Title
Economic development; other; assessments on certain rental transactions; establish. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5018'09
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Discharge Committee Defeated | |
2010-03-23 | Referred To Committee On Finance | |
2010-03-18 | Transmitted | |
2010-03-18 | Passed Roll Call # 88 Yeas 56 Nays 52 | |
2010-03-18 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-03-18 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-03-18 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-03-18 | Substitute H-4 Adopted And Amended | |
2010-03-18 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-03-09 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-03-09 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 | |
2010-01-21 | Re-referred To Committee On Tourism, Outdoor Recreation And Natural Resources | |
2009-06-23 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-06-23 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 | |
2009-06-02 | Printed Bill Filed 05/29/2009 | |
2009-05-28 | Referred To Committee On Tourism, Outdoor Recreation And Natural Resources | |
2009-05-28 | Read A First Time | |
2009-05-28 | Introduced By Representative Woodrow Stanley |