MI HB4999 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-31 - Assigned Pa 135'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-31 - Assigned Pa 135'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Taxation; other; local unit of government implementing an excise tax on the manufacture, distribution, or sale of food; prohibit. Creates new act.
Title
Taxation; other; local unit of government implementing an excise tax on the manufacture, distribution, or sale of food; prohibit. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-10-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 386 (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-10-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 294 (Y: 101 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 294 (Y: 101 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-31 | House | Assigned Pa 135'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-10-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/26/2017 @ 2:22 Pm |
2017-10-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/26/2017 @ 12:03 Pm |
2017-10-17 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/16/2017 @ 2:36 Pm |
2017-10-12 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2017-10-12 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect |
2017-10-12 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 386 Yeas 30 Nays 5 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 |
2017-10-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2017-10-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-10-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-10-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2017-10-05 | House | Transmitted |
2017-10-05 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 294 Yeas 101 Nays 7 |
2017-10-05 | House | Amended |
2017-10-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-10-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-10-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-10-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-10-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-09-26 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/20/2017 |
2017-09-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Michigan Competitiveness |
2017-09-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-09-20 | House | Introduced By Representative Rob Verheulen |