MI HB4991 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-28 - Assigned Pa 233'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Health occupations: health professionals; licensing sanctions for health professionals who are nonparticipating providers and fail to provide certain notices or accept certain payment; establish. Amends sec. 16226 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.16226). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4990'19, HB 4460'19, HB 4459'19

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health occupations: health professionals; licensing sanctions for health professionals who are nonparticipating providers and fail to provide certain notices or accept certain payment; establish. Amends sec. 16226 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.16226). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4990'19, HB 4460'19, HB 4459'19

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-13 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 468 (Y: 101 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 364 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 304 (Y: 104 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-28HouseAssigned Pa 233'20 With Immediate Effect
2020-10-28HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 10/22/2020 12:14 Pm
2020-10-28HouseApproved By The Governor 10/22/2020 11:28 Am
2020-10-14HousePresented To The Governor 10/16/2020 01:46 Pm
2020-10-13HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2020-10-13HouseTitle Amendment Agreed To
2020-10-13HouseRoll Call Roll Call # 468 Yeas 101 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 6
2020-10-13HouseSenate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
2020-09-30HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2020-09-30HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment
2020-09-30SenateTitle Amended
2020-09-30SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 364 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2020-09-30SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2020-09-30SenateRules Suspended
2020-09-30SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
2020-09-30SenateSubstitute (s-1) Concurred In
2020-09-30SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2020-09-09SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
2020-09-09SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2020-09-09SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2020-07-23SenateReassigned To Committee On Insurance And Banking
2020-07-23SenatePlaced On Order Of General Orders
2020-07-23SenateDischarge Committee Approved
2020-06-25SenateReferred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services
2020-06-24HouseTransmitted
2020-06-24HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 304 Yeas 104 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
2020-06-24HouseRead A Third Time
2020-06-24HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2020-06-24HousePlaced On Third Reading
2020-06-24HouseRead A Second Time
2020-06-24HouseReferred To Second Reading
2020-06-24HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2019-11-07HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means
2019-09-19HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 09/19/2019
2019-09-18HouseReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2019-09-18HouseRead A First Time
2019-09-18HouseIntroduced By Representative Frank Liberati

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-4991
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-4991.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBH-4991.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBS-4991.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/House/htm/2019-HNB-4991.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-06-24-058.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-09-09-067.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-09-30-075.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-10-13-083.htm

Bill Comments

feedback