MI HB4984 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-18)
Status: Passed on October 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-13 - Assigned Pa 191'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-18)
Status: Passed on October 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-13 - Assigned Pa 191'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure: expunction; number of felony and misdemeanor offenses that may be set aside; expand. Amends sec. 1 of 1965 PA 213 (MCL 780.621).
Title
Criminal procedure: expunction; number of felony and misdemeanor offenses that may be set aside; expand. Amends sec. 1 of 1965 PA 213 (MCL 780.621).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 336 (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 309 (Y: 97 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 309 (Y: 97 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-13 | House | Assigned Pa 191'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-10-13 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/13/2020 11:26 Am |
2020-10-13 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/12/2020 01:58 Pm |
2020-09-29 | House | Presented To The Governor 09/29/2020 03:40 Pm |
2020-09-24 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-09-24 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 336 Yeas 30 Nays 7 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-11-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2019-11-05 | House | Transmitted |
2019-11-05 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 309 Yeas 97 Nays 11 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2019-11-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-11-05 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-11-05 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-11-05 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2019-11-05 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-10-29 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-10-29 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-09-18 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/18/2019 |
2019-09-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2019-09-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-09-17 | House | Introduced By Representative David Lagrand |