MI HB4958 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Introduced on September 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-12 - Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/07/2023
Pending: House Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-12 - Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/07/2023
Pending: House Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Human services: medical services; abortion as service provided with public funds to welfare recipient; revise. Repeals secs. 109a, 109d & 109e of 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.109a et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4949'23, HB 4959'23
Title
Human services: medical services; abortion as service provided with public funds to welfare recipient; revise. Repeals secs. 109a, 109d & 109e of 1939 PA 280 (MCL 400.109a et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4949'23, HB 4959'23
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-12 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/07/2023 |
2023-09-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2023-09-07 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-09-07 | House | Introduced By Representative Regina Weiss |
Same As/Similar To
HB4949 (Same As) 2023-12-31 - Assigned Pa 286'23
HB4959 (Same As) 2023-09-12 - Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/07/2023
HB4959 (Same As) 2023-09-12 - Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/07/2023