MI HB4958 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-08 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-08 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health occupations: physicians; nonconsensual pelvic examinations; prohibit. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding sec. 16279.
Title
Health occupations: physicians; nonconsensual pelvic examinations; prohibit. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding sec. 16279.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 302 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 302 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-11-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2019-11-05 | House | Transmitted |
2019-11-05 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 302 Yeas 108 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2019-11-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-10-29 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-10-29 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-10-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-10-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-10-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2019-09-17 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/17/2019 |
2019-09-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2019-09-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-09-12 | House | Introduced By Representative Pamela Hornberger |