MI HB4945 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Assigned Pa 139'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Assigned Pa 139'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control; traffic regulation; prohibition on operation of golf cart on state trunk line highway; eliminate under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 657a of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.657a).
Title
Traffic control; traffic regulation; prohibition on operation of golf cart on state trunk line highway; eliminate under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 657a of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.657a).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 238 (Y: 67 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 217 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 399 (Y: 68 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-31 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 217 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 399 (Y: 68 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-31 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | House | Assigned Pa 139'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-05-10 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 5/10/2018 @ 10:52 Am |
2018-05-10 | House | Approved By The Governor 5/9/2018 @ 3:38 Pm |
2018-05-01 | House | Presented To The Governor 4/26/2018 @ 3:56 Pm |
2018-04-24 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-04-24 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-04-24 | House | Roll Call # 238 Yeas 67 Nays 40 |
2018-04-24 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-04-19 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-04-19 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 217 Yeas 35 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Adopted |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-11-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2017-11-09 | House | Transmitted |
2017-11-09 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 399 Yeas 68 Nays 39 |
2017-11-09 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-11-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-11-08 | House | Substitute H-4 Adopted |
2017-11-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-10-31 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-10-31 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 |
2017-09-14 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/13/2017 |
2017-09-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2017-09-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-09-13 | House | Introduced By Representative Aaron Miller |