MI HB4926 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Vetoed By The Governor 12/28/2018 12/31/18 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Vetoed By The Governor 12/28/2018 12/31/18 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Gaming; other; internet gaming; allow and regulate. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4927'17
Title
Gaming; other; internet gaming; allow and regulate. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4927'17
Sponsors
Rep. Brandt Iden [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-21 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 988 (Y: 71 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 1018 (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 551 (Y: 68 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 1018 (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 551 (Y: 68 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | House | Vetoed By The Governor 12/28/2018 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/27/2018 @ 3:40 Pm |
2018-12-21 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-21 | House | Roll Call # 988 Yeas 71 Nays 35 |
2018-12-21 | House | Senate Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2018-12-20 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-12-20 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-2 |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 1018 Yeas 33 Nays 5 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 As Amended |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Substitute S-2 As Amended Concurred In |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 And Amendment(s) |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2018-06-12 | House | Transmitted |
2018-06-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 551 Yeas 68 Nays 40 |
2018-06-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-06-12 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-06-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-06-12 | House | Substitute H-4 Adopted And Amended |
2018-06-12 | House | Substitute H-3 Not Adopted |
2018-06-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-12-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-12-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 |
2017-09-13 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/12/2017 |
2017-09-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2017-09-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-09-12 | House | Introduced By Representative Brandt Iden |