MI HB4922 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Assigned Pa 108'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Assigned Pa 108'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles; inspection; records of collection and disposition of inspection fees; allow for review by local government. Amends sec. 217c of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.217c).
Title
Vehicles; inspection; records of collection and disposition of inspection fees; allow for review by local government. Amends sec. 217c of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.217c).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 175 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 170 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 44 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 170 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 44 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Assigned Pa 108'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-04-10 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 4/5/2018 @ 3:02 Pm |
2018-04-10 | House | Approved By The Governor 4/2/2018 @ 11:58 Am |
2018-04-10 | House | Presented To The Governor 3/26/2018 @ 12:54 Pm |
2018-03-21 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-03-21 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-03-21 | House | Roll Call # 175 Yeas 107 Nays 1 |
2018-03-21 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-03-20 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 170 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2018-03-20 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-02-01 | House | Transmitted |
2018-02-01 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 44 Yeas 109 Nays 0 |
2018-02-01 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-10-31 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-10-31 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-10-24 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-10-24 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-09-13 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/12/2017 |
2017-09-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Trade |
2017-09-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-09-12 | House | Introduced By Representative Jeff Yaroch |