MI HB4894 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-23 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary, With Substitute (h-1)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-23 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary, With Substitute (h-1)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Financial institutions: credit cards; notice of insufficient funds and lack of payment; require to be deemed as evidence of intent. Amends sec. 157w of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.157w).
Title
Financial institutions: credit cards; notice of insufficient funds and lack of payment; require to be deemed as evidence of intent. Amends sec. 157w of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.157w).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary, With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-05-25 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/20/2021 |
2021-05-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Financial Services |
2021-05-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-05-20 | House | Introduced By Representative Greg Vanwoerkom |