MI HB4888 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Assigned Pa 75'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Assigned Pa 75'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control; traffic regulation; definition of "charitable or civic organization" in section 676b of the Michigan vehicle code; modify. Amends sec. 676b of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.676b).
Title
Traffic control; traffic regulation; definition of "charitable or civic organization" in section 676b of the Michigan vehicle code; modify. Amends sec. 676b of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.676b).
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Lauwers [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 127 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 278 (Y: 102 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 278 (Y: 102 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | House | Assigned Pa 75'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-03-20 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 3/19/2018 @ 1:20 Pm |
2018-03-20 | House | Approved By The Governor 3/19/2018 @ 11:37 Am |
2018-03-13 | House | Presented To The Governor 3/8/2018 @ 2:12 Pm |
2018-03-06 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-03-06 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-03-06 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 127 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-09-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2017-09-20 | House | Transmitted |
2017-09-20 | House | Title Amended |
2017-09-20 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 278 Yeas 102 Nays 5 |
2017-09-20 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-09-19 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-09-19 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2017-09-19 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-09-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-09-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2017-09-06 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 08/16/2017 |
2017-08-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2017-08-16 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-08-16 | House | Introduced By Representative Dan Lauwers |
Subjects
Businesses: charitable organizations
Businesses: nonprofit corporations
Traffic control: pedestrians
Traffic control: traffic regulation
Businesses: nonprofit corporations
Traffic control: pedestrians
Traffic control: traffic regulation