MI HB4887 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on October 2 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-10-04 - Presented To The Governor 10/4/2018 @ 10:02 Am
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Occupations; pawnbrokers; hold process for pawned goods; establish. Amends title & sec. 10 of 1917 PA 273 (MCL 446.210) & adds sec. 12.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Occupations; pawnbrokers; hold process for pawned goods; establish. Amends title & sec. 10 of 1917 PA 273 (MCL 446.210) & adds sec. 12.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-02 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 585 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 577 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 137 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-04HousePresented To The Governor 10/4/2018 @ 10:02 Am
2018-10-02HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2018-10-02HouseTitle Amendment Agreed To
2018-10-02House Roll Call # 585 Yeas 106 Nays 0
2018-10-02HouseSenate Substitute S-1 Concurred In
2018-09-27HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2018-09-27HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment
2018-09-26SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 577 Yeas 35 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2018-09-26SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2018-09-26SenateRules Suspended
2018-09-26SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2018-09-26SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2018-09-26SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2018-09-25SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2018-09-25SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-09-25SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2018-03-08SenateReferred To Committee On Commerce
2018-03-07HouseTransmitted
2018-03-07HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 137 Yeas 107 Nays 1
2018-03-07HouseRead A Third Time
2018-03-06HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-03-06HouseRead A Second Time
2017-11-28HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-11-28HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2017-09-06HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 08/16/2017
2017-08-16HouseReferred To Committee On Commerce And Trade
2017-08-16HouseRead A First Time
2017-08-16HouseIntroduced By Representative Peter Lucido

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-HB-4887
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/House/htm/2017-HIB-4887.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBH-4887.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBS-4887.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/House/htm/2017-HNB-4887.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-11-28-090.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-03-07-025.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-09-25-065.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-09-26-066.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-10-02-066.htm

Bill Comments

feedback