MI HB4879 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-08 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-08 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Corporate income tax: deductions; deduction for net operating losses; modify. Amends secs. 12, 607 & 623 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.12 et seq.).
Title
Corporate income tax: deductions; deduction for net operating losses; modify. Amends secs. 12, 607 & 623 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.12 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-12-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2021-05-20 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/19/2021 |
2021-05-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2021-05-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-05-19 | House | Introduced By Representative Diana Farrington |