MI HB4863 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-11-26 - Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
Pending: Senate Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-11-26 - Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
Pending: Senate Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Probate: trusts; powers of appointment; revise. Amends secs. 5a & 14 of 1967 PA 224 (MCL 556.115a & 556.124). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4864'23
Title
Probate: trusts; powers of appointment; revise. Amends secs. 5a & 14 of 1967 PA 224 (MCL 556.115a & 556.124). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4864'23
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Haadsma [D] | Rep. Douglas Wozniak [R] | Rep. Stephanie Young [D] | Rep. Julie Rogers [D] |
Rep. Tyrone Carter [D] | Rep. Nate Shannon [D] | Rep. Kevin Coleman [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-11-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 353 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-11-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety |
2024-11-14 | House | Transmitted |
2024-11-14 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 353 Yeas 102 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 8 |
2024-11-14 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2024-11-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2024-01-17 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2024-01-17 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-10-25 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-10-25 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2023-07-18 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/28/2023 |
2023-06-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2023-06-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-06-28 | House | Introduced By Representative Jim Haadsma |
Same As/Similar To
HB4864 (Same As) 2024-11-26 - Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety