MI HB4839 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-24 - Referred To Committee On Elections
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-24 - Referred To Committee On Elections
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Elections: absent voters; election options on absent voter ballot applications; modify and expand. Amends sec. 759 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.759).
Title
Elections: absent voters; election options on absent voter ballot applications; modify and expand. Amends sec. 759 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.759).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 361 (Y: 106 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections |
2021-06-23 | House | Transmitted |
2021-06-23 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 361 Yeas 106 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2021-06-23 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-06-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-06-22 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-06-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-06-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-06-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-05-18 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/13/2021 |
2021-05-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2021-05-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-05-13 | House | Introduced By Representative Brad Paquette |
Subjects
Elections: absent voters
Elections: election officials
Elections: presidential primary
Elections: primary
State agencies (existing): state
Elections: election officials
Elections: presidential primary
Elections: primary
State agencies (existing): state