MI HB4832 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on June 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-10-12 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-10-12 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resources: inland lakes; structure or fill on inland lake or stream bottomlands; authorize DEGLE to issue emergency order concerning. Amends 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.101 - 324.90106) by adding sec. 30111d.
Title
Natural resources: inland lakes; structure or fill on inland lake or stream bottomlands; authorize DEGLE to issue emergency order concerning. Amends 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.101 - 324.90106) by adding sec. 30111d.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-10-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-10-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-3) |
2023-06-22 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/21/2023 |
2023-06-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources, Environment, Tourism And Outdoor Recreation |
2023-06-21 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-06-21 | House | Introduced By Representative Julie M. Rogers |