MI HB4818 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Introduced on June 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-29 - Printed Bill Filed 06/29/2011
Pending: House Tax Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-29 - Printed Bill Filed 06/29/2011
Pending: House Tax Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax; deductions; pension tax; eliminate limitations and restrictions. Amends sec. 30 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.30).
Title
Income tax; deductions; pension tax; eliminate limitations and restrictions. Amends sec. 30 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.30).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-29 | House | Printed Bill Filed 06/29/2011 |
2011-06-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2011-06-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-06-28 | House | Introduced By Representative Jim Townsend |
Same As/Similar To
SB0519 (Same As) 2011-06-23 - Referred To Committee On Reforms, Restructuring And Reinventing
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2011-HB-4818 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billintroduced/House/htm/2011-HIB-4818.htm |