MI HB4814 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Introduced on August 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-26 - Passed Roll Call # 170 Yeas 107 Nays 1
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-26 - Passed Roll Call # 170 Yeas 107 Nays 1
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public employees and officers; state; posting of organization charts for each state department; require. Creates new act.
Title
Public employees and officers; state; posting of organization charts for each state department; require. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 672 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 652 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-09-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 170 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 652 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-09-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 170 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | Passed Roll Call # 170 Yeas 107 Nays 1 |
2016-04-26 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-04-21 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2016-04-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-04-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-03-24 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2015-08-19 | House | Printed Bill Filed 08/19/2015 |
2015-08-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Oversight And Ethics |
2015-08-18 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-08-18 | House | Introduced By Representative Jim Runestad |
Subjects
Public employees and officers: state
State agencies (existing): generally
State agencies (existing): technology, management, and budget
State agencies (existing): generally
State agencies (existing): technology, management, and budget