MI HB4812 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Assigned Pa 93'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Agriculture; other; certain feed standards; modify compliance with federal regulations. Amends secs. 3, 4, 5, 6, 13 & 14 of 1975 PA 120 (MCL 287.523 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4811'17

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agriculture; other; certain feed standards; modify compliance with federal regulations. Amends secs. 3, 4, 5, 6, 13 & 14 of 1975 PA 120 (MCL 287.523 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4811'17

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 142 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 293 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10HouseAssigned Pa 93'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-04-10HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 3/26/2018 @ 3:14 Pm
2018-04-10HouseApproved By The Governor 3/26/2018 @ 12:20 Pm
2018-03-20HousePresented To The Governor 3/16/2018 @ 10:41 Am
2018-03-08HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2018-03-08HouseFull Title Agreed To
2018-03-08HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2018-03-08SenateInserted Full Title
2018-03-08SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 142 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2018-03-07SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2018-03-07SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2018-02-28SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2018-02-28SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-02-28SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2017-10-10SenateReferred To Committee On Agriculture
2017-10-05HouseTransmitted
2017-10-05HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 293 Yeas 108 Nays 0
2017-10-05HouseRead A Third Time
2017-10-04HousePlaced On Third Reading
2017-10-04HouseRead A Second Time
2017-09-27HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-09-27HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2017-08-16HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 07/12/2017
2017-07-12HouseReferred To Committee On Agriculture
2017-07-12HouseRead A First Time
2017-07-12HouseIntroduced By Representative Roger Victory

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-HB-4812
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/House/htm/2017-HIB-4812.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBH-4812.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBS-4812.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/House/htm/2017-HNB-4812.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2018-PA-0093.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-09-27-070.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-10-05-074.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-02-28-022.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-03-08-026.htm

Bill Comments

feedback