MI HB4787 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-09 - Assigned Pa 149'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-09 - Assigned Pa 149'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; other; coercing female to have an abortion against her will; prohibit, and provide penalties. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding sec. 213a.
Title
Crimes; other; coercing female to have an abortion against her will; prohibit, and provide penalties. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding sec. 213a.
Sponsors
Rep. Amanda Price [R] | Rep. Kurt Heise [R] | Rep. Aaron Miller [R] | Rep. Thomas Hooker [R] |
Rep. Joel Johnson [R] | Rep. Bruce Rendon [R] | Sen. James Runestad [R] | Rep. Klint Kesto [R] |
Rep. Cindy Gamrat [R] | Rep. Nancy Jenkins [R] | Rep. Lee Chatfield [R] | Rep. Kathy Crawford [R] |
Sen. Dan Lauwers [R] | Sen. Ed McBroom [R] | Rep. Larry Inman [R] | Sen. Tom Barrett [R] |
Rep. Laura Cox [R] | Rep. Martin Howrylak [R] | Rep. Philip Potvin [R] | Sen. Lana Theis [R] |
Rep. Gary Glenn [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 329 (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 142 (Y: 65 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 142 (Y: 65 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | House | Assigned Pa 149'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-06-09 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/9/2016 @ 1:28 Pm |
2016-06-09 | House | Approved By The Governor 6/8/2016 @ 2:16 Pm |
2016-06-01 | House | Presented To The Governor 5/31/2016 @ 12:00 Pm |
2016-05-25 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2016-05-25 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-05-25 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 329 Yeas 26 Nays 11 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2016-03-24 | House | Transmitted |
2016-03-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 142 Yeas 65 Nays 43 |
2016-03-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-03-24 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2016-03-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-03-24 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2016-03-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-09-29 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-09-29 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2015-07-15 | House | Printed Bill Filed 07/15/2015 |
2015-07-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice |
2015-07-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-07-14 | House | Introduced By Representative Amanda Price |