MI HB4783 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-4)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 447'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Economic development; other; next Michigan development act; modify. Amends sec. 5 of 2010 PA 275 (MCL 125.2955).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economic development; other; next Michigan development act; modify. Amends sec. 5 of 2010 PA 275 (MCL 125.2955).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-12-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 829 (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 459 (Y: 83 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-31HouseAssigned Pa 447'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
2014-12-31HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 1/2/2015 @ 2:44 Pm 2014 Addenda
2014-12-31HouseApproved By The Governor 12/27/2014 @ 8:22 Pm 2014 Addenda
2014-12-30HousePresented To The Governor 12/23/2014 @ 9:32 Am
2014-12-17HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2014-12-17HouseFull Title Agreed To
2014-12-17HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2014-12-17SenateInserted Full Title
2014-12-17SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 829 Yeas 31 Nays 6 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2014-12-16SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2014-12-16SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2014-12-04SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2014-12-04SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2014-12-04SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2014-09-11SenateReferred To Committee On Economic Development
2014-09-09HouseTransmitted
2014-09-09HouseRep. Ed Mcbroom Removed As Sponsor
2014-09-09HouseTitle Amended
2014-09-09HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 459 Yeas 83 Nays 27
2014-09-09HouseRead A Third Time
2014-08-27HousePlaced On Third Reading
2014-08-27HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted
2014-08-27HouseRead A Second Time
2014-06-11HouseReferred To Second Reading
2014-06-11HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2013-05-30HousePrinted Bill Filed 05/30/2013
2013-05-29HouseReferred To Committee On Commerce
2013-05-29HouseRead A First Time
2013-05-29HouseIntroduced By Representative Ed Mcbroom

Same As/Similar To

SB0397 (Same As) 2013-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0238'13 With Immediate Effect

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2013-HB-4783
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billintroduced/House/htm/2013-HIB-4783.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billengrossed/House/htm/2013-HEBH-4783.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billengrossed/House/htm/2013-HEBS-4783.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billenrolled/House/htm/2013-HNB-4783.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/publicact/htm/2014-PA-0447.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/House/htm/2014-HJ-06-11-057.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/House/htm/2014-HJ-09-09-063.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/Senate/htm/2014-SJ-12-04-077.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/Senate/htm/2014-SJ-12-17-083.htm

Bill Comments

feedback