MI SB0397 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0238'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0238'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; other; next Michigan development act; modify. Amends sec. 5 of 2010 PA 275 (MCL 125.2955).
Title
Economic development; other; next Michigan development act; modify. Amends sec. 5 of 2010 PA 275 (MCL 125.2955).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-12-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 472 (Y: 87 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 374 (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 374 (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0238'13 With Immediate Effect |
2013-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/26/2013 @ 1:38 Pm |
2013-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/21/2013 @ 4:14 Pm |
2013-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/18/2013 @ 10:34 Am 2013 Addenda |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2013-12-11 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2013-12-11 | House | Returned To Senate |
2013-12-11 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2013-12-11 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 472 Yeas 87 Nays 22 |
2013-12-11 | House | Read A Third Time |
2013-11-14 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2013-11-14 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-11-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-11-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2013-09-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce |
2013-09-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-09-26 | House | Received On 09/26/2013 |
2013-09-26 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 374 Yeas 33 Nays 4 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2013-09-25 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2013-09-25 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2013-09-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2013-09-19 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-09-19 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic Development |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Thomas Casperson |
Same As/Similar To
HB4783 (Same As) 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 447'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda