MI HB4782 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-15 - Assigned Pa 141'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-15 - Assigned Pa 141'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for failure to originate and maintain record of deposits on certain containers with intent to defraud or cheat; create. Amends sec. 14h, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.14h). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4783'21
Title
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for failure to originate and maintain record of deposits on certain containers with intent to defraud or cheat; create. Amends sec. 14h, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.14h). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4783'21
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-09 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 596 (Y: 98 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 468 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-10-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 295 (Y: 104 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 468 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-10-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 295 (Y: 104 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-15 | House | Assigned Pa 141'21 With Immediate Effect |
2021-12-15 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/27/2021 12:16 Pm |
2021-12-15 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/23/2021 10:04 Am |
2021-12-14 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/14/2021 09:46 Am |
2021-12-09 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2021-12-09 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2021-12-09 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 596 Yeas 98 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 |
2021-12-09 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2021-12-08 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2021-12-08 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2021-12-08 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2021-12-08 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 468 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2021-12-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-12-07 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2021-12-07 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2021-06-03 | House | Transmitted |
2021-06-03 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 295 Yeas 104 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2021-06-03 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-06-02 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-06-02 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-05-27 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-05-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-05-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Rules And Competitiveness |
2021-05-25 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-05-25 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-05-05 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/04/2021 |
2021-05-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2021-05-04 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-05-04 | House | Introduced By Representative Tim Sneller |