MI HB4753 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 37-14)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 497'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 37-14)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 497'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax; assessments; assessment cap on property if transferred to immediate family member and use does not change; retain. Amends sec. 27a of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.27a).
Title
Property tax; assessments; assessment cap on property if transferred to immediate family member and use does not change; retain. Amends sec. 27a of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.27a).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 1091 (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 891 (Y: 101 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 915 (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 361 (Y: 105 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 891 (Y: 101 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 915 (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 361 (Y: 105 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 497'12 With Immediate Effect 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2012 @ 1:38 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/27/2012 @ 9:50 Am 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-27 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/21/2012 @ 11:46 Am |
2012-12-14 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-14 | House | Re-returned From Senate With Concurrence To House Substitute H-3 To Senate Substitute S-2 |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Roll Call # 1091 Yeas 32 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-14 | Senate | House Substitute H-3 To Senate Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Returned From House With Substitute H-3 To Senate Substitute S-2 |
2012-12-14 | House | Retransmitted |
2012-12-14 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-14 | House | Roll Call # 891 Yeas 101 Nays 5 |
2012-12-14 | House | Senate Substitute S-2 Concurred In As Substituted H-3 |
2012-12-14 | House | Substitute H-3 Adopted |
2012-12-12 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2012-12-12 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-2 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 915 Yeas 32 Nays 5 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-06-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2012-06-06 | House | Transmitted |
2012-06-06 | House | Title Amended |
2012-06-06 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 361 Yeas 105 Nays 4 |
2012-06-06 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-06-05 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-06-05 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2012-06-05 | House | Substitute H-1 Not Adopted |
2012-06-05 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-05-30 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-05-30 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2011-06-16 | House | Printed Bill Filed 06/16/2011 |
2011-06-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2011-06-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-06-15 | House | Introduced By Representative Peter Pettalia |