MI HB4743 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Veterans; veterans' homes; testing of water for lead at veterans' facilities established under the Michigan veterans' facility authority act; require. Amends 2016 PA 560 (MCL 36.101 - 36.112) by adding sec. 6a.
Title
Veterans; veterans' homes; testing of water for lead at veterans' facilities established under the Michigan veterans' facility authority act; require. Amends 2016 PA 560 (MCL 36.101 - 36.112) by adding sec. 6a.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Tate [D] | Rep. Gary Howell [R] | Rep. Jewell Jones [D] | Rep. William Sowerby [D] |
Rep. Tyrone Carter [D] | Rep. Lori Stone [D] | Rep. Alex Garza [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-06-26 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/26/2019 |
2019-06-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources And Outdoor Recreation |
2019-06-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-06-20 | House | Introduced By Representative Joseph Tate |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-4743 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-4743.htm |