MI HB4741 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-28 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-28 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Corrections; jails; time confined in cells for incarcerated individuals under 21 years of age; develop policies to limit. Amends 1953 PA 232 (MCL 791.201 - 791.285) by adding sec. 64a.
Title
Corrections; jails; time confined in cells for incarcerated individuals under 21 years of age; develop policies to limit. Amends 1953 PA 232 (MCL 791.201 - 791.285) by adding sec. 64a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-28 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-11-28 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-06-13 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/08/2017 |
2017-06-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Law And Justice |
2017-06-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-06-08 | House | Introduced By Representative Martin Howrylak |
Subjects
Corrections: alternatives
Corrections: jails
Corrections: state facilities
Juveniles: criminal procedure
Corrections: jails
Corrections: state facilities
Juveniles: criminal procedure