MI HB4733 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on December 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-08 - Vetoed By The Governor 12/22/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-08 - Vetoed By The Governor 12/22/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Retirement: state employees; annuity option; provide for. Amends sec. 58 of 1943 PA 240 (MCL 38.58).
Title
Retirement: state employees; annuity option; provide for. Amends sec. 58 of 1943 PA 240 (MCL 38.58).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 319 (Y: 105 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-08 | House | Vetoed By The Governor 12/22/2022 |
2022-12-08 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/13/2022 11:44 Am |
2022-12-08 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-12-08 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-12-08 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 504 Yeas 94 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 12 |
2022-12-08 | House | Senate Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2022-12-07 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2022-12-07 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-2) With Full Title |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 539 Yeas 23 Nays 8 Excused 7 Not Voting 0 |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2021-06-09 | House | Transmitted |
2021-06-09 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 319 Yeas 105 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2021-06-09 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-06-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-06-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-05-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-05-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-05-04 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/29/2021 |
2021-04-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2021-04-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-04-29 | House | Introduced By Representative Terry Sabo |