MI HB4725 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-10 - Placed On Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-10 - Placed On Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Education; alternative; residential boarding schools for at-risk youths; allow public school academies to operate. Amends sec. 504 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.504) & adds sec. 505b.
Title
Education; alternative; residential boarding schools for at-risk youths; allow public school academies to operate. Amends sec. 504 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.504) & adds sec. 505b.
Sponsors
Rep. John Olumba [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-10 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-12-10 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-06-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-06-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2013-05-15 | House | Printed Bill Filed 05/15/2013 |
2013-05-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2013-05-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-05-14 | House | Introduced By Representative John Olumba |