MI HB4707 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Veterans
Pending: Senate Families, Seniors And Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Children: protection; oversight authority to develop use of standard child abuse and neglect investigation and interview protocol; implement. Amends sec. 8 of 1975 PA 238 (MCL 722.628).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children: protection; oversight authority to develop use of standard child abuse and neglect investigation and interview protocol; implement. Amends sec. 8 of 1975 PA 238 (MCL 722.628).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 18 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-21SenateReferred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Veterans
2020-01-16HouseTransmitted
2020-01-16HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 18 Yeas 106 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
2020-01-16HouseRead A Third Time
2020-01-14HousePlaced On Third Reading
2020-01-14HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2020-01-14HouseRead A Second Time
2019-12-10HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-12-10HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2019-09-18HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary, With Substitute (h-1)
2019-06-12HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 06/12/2019
2019-06-11HouseReferred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors
2019-06-11HouseRead A First Time
2019-06-11HouseIntroduced By Representative Frank Liberati

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback