MI HB4700 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-15 - Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics
Pending: Senate Elections And Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-15 - Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics
Pending: Senate Elections And Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Elections: absent voters; signature matching and curing for absent voter ballot applications and absent voter ballot return envelopes; provide for, and provide for modifications to the absent voter ballot application and process. Amends secs. 759, 761 & 766 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.759 et seq.); adds secs. 766a & 766b & repeals sec. 759c of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.759c). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4594'23, HB 4756'23
Title
Elections: absent voters; signature matching and curing for absent voter ballot applications and absent voter ballot return envelopes; provide for, and provide for modifications to the absent voter ballot application and process. Amends secs. 759, 761 & 766 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.759 et seq.); adds secs. 766a & 766b & repeals sec. 759c of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.759c). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4594'23, HB 4756'23
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 164 (Y: 56 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2023-06-14 | House | Transmitted |
2023-06-14 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 164 Yeas 56 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2023-06-14 | House | Amended |
2023-06-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2023-06-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2023-06-13 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2023-06-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-06-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-06-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2023-06-07 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/06/2023 |
2023-06-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections |
2023-06-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-06-06 | House | Introduced By Representative Carrie Rheingans |
Same As/Similar To
HB4594 (Same As) 2023-06-13 - Placed On Third Reading
HB4756 (Same As) 2023-06-20 - Referred To Second Reading
HB4756 (Same As) 2023-06-20 - Referred To Second Reading