MI HB4689 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-10 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-10 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Public employees and officers: ethics; state senators and representatives; prohibit from engaging in certain lobbying activities. Amends 1978 PA 472 (MCL 4.411 - 4.431) by adding sec. 6c.
Title
Public employees and officers: ethics; state senators and representatives; prohibit from engaging in certain lobbying activities. Amends 1978 PA 472 (MCL 4.411 - 4.431) by adding sec. 6c.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 316 (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2021-06-09 | House | Transmitted |
2021-06-09 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 316 Yeas 106 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2021-06-09 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-06-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-06-08 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-06-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-05-20 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-05-20 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-05-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Rules And Competitiveness, With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-04-22 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/21/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2021-04-21 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-04-21 | House | Introduced By Representative Andrea Schroeder |