MI HB4676 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 9 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Children: foster care; education requirements for children placed in foster care; provide for. Amends sec. 8b of 1994 PA 203 (MCL 722.958b).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children: foster care; education requirements for children placed in foster care; provide for. Amends sec. 8b of 1994 PA 203 (MCL 722.958b).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 20 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 563 (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 563 (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-21HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2024-02-22HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Title Amendment
2024-02-21SenateTitle Amended
2024-02-21SenatePassed Roll Call # 20 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2024-02-20SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
2024-02-20SenateSubstitute (s-1) Concurred In
2024-02-20SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2024-02-14SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
2024-02-14SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2023-11-14SenateReferred To Committee On Housing And Human Services
2023-11-09HouseTransmitted
2023-11-09HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 563 Yeas 104 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
2023-11-09HouseRead A Third Time
2023-11-09HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2023-11-09HousePlaced On Third Reading
2023-11-09HouseSubstitute (h-2) Adopted
2023-11-09HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2023-11-09HouseRead A Second Time
2023-06-13HouseReferred To Second Reading
2023-06-13HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2023-05-30HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 05/25/2023
2023-05-25HouseReferred To Committee On Families, Children And Seniors
2023-05-25HouseRead A First Time
2023-05-25HouseIntroduced By Representative Stephanie A. Young

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2023-HB-4676
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billintroduced/House/htm/2023-HIB-4676.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billengrossed/House/htm/2023-HEBH-4676.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billengrossed/House/htm/2023-HEBS-4676.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2023-HCVBS-4676-0N295.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2023-HCVBS-4676-0O338.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2023-HCVBS-4676-0O339.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2023-HCVBS-4676-00B721.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2023-HCVBS-4676-00D424.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-4676-4E26FE57.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-4676-9EEC8FC4.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-4676-L.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-4676-F.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/House/htm/2023-HJ-06-13-054.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/House/htm/2023-HJ-11-09-097.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/Senate/htm/2024-SJ-02-14-014.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/Senate/htm/2024-SJ-02-21-017.htm

Bill Comments

feedback