MI HB4676 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Juveniles; criminal procedure; age of juvenile jurisdiction in youth rehabilitation services act; modify. Amends sec. 2 of 1974 PA 150 (MCL 803.302).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juveniles; criminal procedure; age of juvenile jurisdiction in youth rehabilitation services act; modify. Amends sec. 2 of 1974 PA 150 (MCL 803.302).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-28HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-11-28HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2017-05-31HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 05/30/2017
2017-05-30HouseReferred To Committee On Law And Justice
2017-05-30HouseRead A First Time
2017-05-30HouseIntroduced By Representative Latanya Garrett

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback