MI HB4669 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-15 - Assigned Pa 47'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-15 - Assigned Pa 47'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax; assessments; sale of shares in certain summer park and resort associations; revise definition of transfer of ownership to exclude. Amends sec. 27a of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.27a). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4668'11
Title
Property tax; assessments; sale of shares in certain summer park and resort associations; revise definition of transfer of ownership to exclude. Amends sec. 27a of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.27a). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4668'11
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 114 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 43 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 43 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | House | Assigned Pa 47'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-03-15 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 3/13/2012 @ 4:02 Pm |
2012-03-15 | House | Approved By The Governor 3/13/2012 @ 2:58 Pm |
2012-03-13 | House | Presented To The Governor 3/13/2012 @ 9:57 Am |
2012-03-08 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled 03/07/2012 |
2012-03-08 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-03-08 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 114 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2012-02-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-02-23 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-02-23 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-02-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2012-02-09 | House | Transmitted |
2012-02-09 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 43 Yeas 105 Nays 0 |
2012-02-09 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-02-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-02-08 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2012-02-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-12-07 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-12-07 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2011-05-25 | House | Printed Bill Filed 05/25/2011 |
2011-05-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2011-05-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-05-24 | House | Introduced By Representative Frank Foster |