MI HB4658 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-23 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-23 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
State financing and management: purchasing; state contracts; modify unsuccessful bidder protest policy. Amends 1984 PA 431 (MCL 18.1101 - 18.1594) by adding sec. 262a. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4462'21
Title
State financing and management: purchasing; state contracts; modify unsuccessful bidder protest policy. Amends 1984 PA 431 (MCL 18.1101 - 18.1594) by adding sec. 262a. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4462'21
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 358 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2021-06-22 | House | Transmitted |
2021-06-22 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 358 Yeas 110 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2021-06-22 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-06-17 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-06-17 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2021-06-17 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-05-25 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-05-25 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-04-21 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/20/2021 |
2021-04-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism |
2021-04-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-04-20 | House | Introduced By Representative Mari Manoogian |
Subjects
State agencies (existing): technology, management, and budget
State financing and management: purchasing
State financing and management: purchasing