MI HB4641 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Assigned Pa 44'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Assigned Pa 44'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development: neighborhood enterprise zones; filing of neighborhood enterprise zone certificate extension; modify. Amends sec. 11 of 1992 PA 147 (MCL 207.781).
Title
Economic development: neighborhood enterprise zones; filing of neighborhood enterprise zone certificate extension; modify. Amends sec. 11 of 1992 PA 147 (MCL 207.781).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 277 (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 241 (Y: 101 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 241 (Y: 101 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-01 | House | Assigned Pa 44'21 With Immediate Effect |
2021-07-01 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 07/01/2021 01:26 Pm |
2021-07-01 | House | Approved By The Governor 07/01/2021 10:46 Am |
2021-06-23 | House | Presented To The Governor 06/23/2021 11:59 Am |
2021-06-17 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2021-06-17 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2021-06-17 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 277 Yeas 32 Nays 3 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic And Small Business Development |
2021-05-26 | House | Transmitted |
2021-05-26 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 241 Yeas 101 Nays 8 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2021-05-26 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-05-25 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-05-25 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-05-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-04-20 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/15/2021 |
2021-04-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism |
2021-04-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-04-15 | House | Introduced By Representative Steve Marino |