MI HB4638 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Filed With Secretary Of State 7/11/2017 @ 1:12 Pm
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; crimes of performing female genital mutilation and of transporting a person for purpose of genital mutilation; provide sentencing guidelines for. Amends sec. 16g, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.16g). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4636'17, HB 4637'17

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; crimes of performing female genital mutilation and of transporting a person for purpose of genital mutilation; provide sentencing guidelines for. Amends sec. 16g, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.16g). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4636'17, HB 4637'17

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 273 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 189 (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-12HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 7/11/2017 @ 1:12 Pm
2017-07-12HouseAssigned Pa 74'17 With Immediate Effect
2017-07-12HouseApproved By The Governor 7/11/2017 @ 11:57 Am
2017-07-12HousePresented To The Governor 6/27/2017 @ 12:00 Pm
2017-06-15HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2017-06-15HouseFull Title Agreed To
2017-06-15HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2017-06-15SenateInserted Full Title
2017-06-15SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 273 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2017-06-15SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2017-06-15SenateRules Suspended
2017-06-15SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2017-06-15SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2017-06-15SenatePlaced On Order Of General Orders
2017-06-15SenateDischarge Committee Approved
2017-06-13SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2017-06-08HouseTransmitted
2017-06-08HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 189 Yeas 105 Nays 2
2017-06-08HouseRead A Third Time
2017-06-07HousePlaced On Third Reading
2017-06-07HouseRead A Second Time
2017-06-06HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-06-06HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2017-05-24HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 05/23/2017
2017-05-23HouseReferred To Committee On Law And Justice
2017-05-23HouseRead A First Time
2017-05-23HouseIntroduced By Representative Daire Rendon

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-HB-4638
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/House/htm/2017-HIB-4638.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBH-4638.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBS-4638.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/House/htm/2017-HNB-4638.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2017-PA-0074.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-06-06-053.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-06-08-055.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-06-15-059.htm

Bill Comments

feedback