MI HB4637 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-14 - Recommendation Concurred In
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-14 - Recommendation Concurred In
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; urban redevelopment corporations; citizens' district council in certain blighted areas; modify. Amends 1945 PA 344 (MCL 125.71 - 125.84) by adding sec. 13a.
Title
Economic development; urban redevelopment corporations; citizens' district council in certain blighted areas; modify. Amends 1945 PA 344 (MCL 125.71 - 125.84) by adding sec. 13a.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-14 | Recommendation Concurred In | |
2009-07-14 | Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Urban Policy | |
2009-03-24 | Printed Bill Filed 03/20/2009 | |
2009-03-19 | Referred To Committee On Intergovernmental And Regional Affairs | |
2009-03-19 | Read A First Time | |
2009-03-19 | Introduced By Representative Bert Johnson |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2009-HB-4637 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2009-2010/billintroduced/House/htm/2009-HIB-4637.htm |