MI HB4630 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-08 - Referred To Committee On Commerce
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-08 - Referred To Committee On Commerce
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Labor; notices; notice requirements in advertising for replacements for striking workers; repeal. Amends title of 1962 PA 150 (MCL 423.251 - 423.254) & repeals sec. 3a of 1962 PA 150 (MCL 423.253a).
Title
Labor; notices; notice requirements in advertising for replacements for striking workers; repeal. Amends title of 1962 PA 150 (MCL 423.251 - 423.254) & repeals sec. 3a of 1962 PA 150 (MCL 423.253a).
Sponsors
Rep. Amanda Price [R] | Rep. Gary Glenn [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-12-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 588 (Y: 59 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Commerce |
2016-12-07 | House | Transmitted |
2016-12-07 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 588 Yeas 59 Nays 48 |
2016-12-07 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-12-06 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-12-06 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-11-29 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-11-29 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2015-05-21 | House | Printed Bill Filed 05/21/2015 |
2015-05-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Trade |
2015-05-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-05-20 | House | Introduced By Representative Amanda Price |