MI HB4625 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-27 - Assigned Pa 101'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-27 - Assigned Pa 101'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Education; teachers; standards for achieving and retaining teacher tenure; revise, and make certain revisions to hearing procedures. Amends secs. 1, 2, 3 & 3a, art. II, secs. 1 & 3, art. III & sec. 4, art. IV of 1937 (Ex Sess) PA 4 (MCL 38.81 et seq.); adds secs. 2a & 3b to art. II & repeals sec. 5, art. IV of 1937 (Ex Sess) PA 4 (MCL 38.105). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4626'11, HB 4627'11, HB 4628'11
Title
Education; teachers; standards for achieving and retaining teacher tenure; revise, and make certain revisions to hearing procedures. Amends secs. 1, 2, 3 & 3a, art. II, secs. 1 & 3, art. III & sec. 4, art. IV of 1937 (Ex Sess) PA 4 (MCL 38.81 et seq.); adds secs. 2a & 3b to art. II & repeals sec. 5, art. IV of 1937 (Ex Sess) PA 4 (MCL 38.105). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4626'11, HB 4627'11, HB 4628'11
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Rogers [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-30 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 294 (Y: 66 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 438 (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 169 (Y: 70 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 438 (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 169 (Y: 70 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-27 | House | Assigned Pa 101'11 With Immediate Effect |
2011-07-27 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 7/19/2011 @ 4:22 Pm |
2011-07-27 | House | Approved By The Governor 7/19/2011 @ 10:45 Am |
2011-07-27 | House | Presented To The Governor 7/6/2011 @ 4:06 Pm |
2011-06-30 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2011-06-30 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2011-06-30 | House | Roll Call # 294 Yeas 66 Nays 42 |
2011-06-30 | House | Senate Substitute S-5 Concurred In |
2011-06-30 | House | Rule Suspended |
2011-06-30 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2011-06-30 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-5 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 438 Yeas 25 Nays 13 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Defeated |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-5 As Amended |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Substitute S-5 As Amended Concurred In |
2011-06-30 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-5 And Amendment(s) |
2011-06-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2011-06-28 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-06-28 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2011-06-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2011-06-09 | House | Transmitted |
2011-06-09 | House | Title Amended |
2011-06-09 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 169 Yeas 70 Nays 37 |
2011-06-09 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-06-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-06-08 | House | Substitute H-7 Adopted And Amended |
2011-06-08 | House | Substitute H-4 Not Adopted |
2011-06-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-05-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-05-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 |
2011-05-11 | House | Printed Bill Filed 05/11/2011 |
2011-05-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2011-05-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-05-10 | House | Introduced By Representative Bill Rogers |