MI HB4617 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Civil rights: public records; enhanced access to public records act; modify. Amends 1976 PA 442 (MCL 15.231 - 15.246) by adding secs. 3a & 23a. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4383'21
Title
Civil rights: public records; enhanced access to public records act; modify. Amends 1976 PA 442 (MCL 15.231 - 15.246) by adding secs. 3a & 23a. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4383'21
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-06-09 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2021-04-14 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/13/2021 |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Oversight |
2021-04-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-04-13 | House | Introduced By Representative Stephanie Young |