MI HB4608 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-9)
Status: Introduced on May 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-19 - Re-referred To Committee On Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-19 - Re-referred To Committee On Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles; motorcycles; motorcycle helmet requirement; abolish under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 658 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.658).
Title
Vehicles; motorcycles; motorcycle helmet requirement; abolish under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 658 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.658).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-10-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-19 | House | Re-referred To Committee On Transportation |
2011-10-26 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-10-26 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2011-05-05 | House | Printed Bill Filed 05/05/2011 |
2011-05-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2011-05-04 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-05-04 | House | Introduced By Representative Peter Pettalia |