MI HB4592 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-6)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Assigned Pa 71'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-6)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Assigned Pa 71'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations; mechanical contractors; installation of certain home thermostats under Forbes mechanical contractors act; authorize for security alarm system providers. Amends secs. 7 & 9 of 1984 PA 192 (MCL 338.977 & 338.979).
Title
Occupations; mechanical contractors; installation of certain home thermostats under Forbes mechanical contractors act; authorize for security alarm system providers. Amends secs. 7 & 9 of 1984 PA 192 (MCL 338.977 & 338.979).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 253 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 156 (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 156 (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | House | Assigned Pa 71'13 With Immediate Effect |
2013-07-03 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/25/2013 @ 2:29 Pm |
2013-07-03 | House | Approved By The Governor 6/25/2013 @ 10:32 Am |
2013-06-18 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/17/2013 @ 1:49 Pm |
2013-06-12 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2013-06-12 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2013-06-12 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 253 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Energy And Technology |
2013-05-22 | House | Transmitted |
2013-05-22 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 156 Yeas 105 Nays 2 |
2013-05-22 | House | Read A Third Time |
2013-05-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2013-05-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-05-21 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-05-21 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2013-04-23 | House | Printed Bill Filed 04/19/2013 |
2013-04-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Energy And Technology |
2013-04-18 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-04-18 | House | Introduced By Representative Bradford Jacobsen |
Subjects
Construction, permits
Occupations, alarm systems
Occupations, mechanical contractors
State agencies (existing), licensing and regulatory affairs
Occupations, alarm systems
Occupations, mechanical contractors
State agencies (existing), licensing and regulatory affairs