MI HB4584 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-18 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-18 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations; other; carnival-amusement safety act; create a Michigan safety amusement star program. Amends sec. 2 of 1966 PA 225 (MCL 408.652) & adds sec. 7a.
Title
Occupations; other; carnival-amusement safety act; create a Michigan safety amusement star program. Amends sec. 2 of 1966 PA 225 (MCL 408.652) & adds sec. 7a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Ways And Means (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2019-05-15 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/15/2019 |
2019-05-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2019-05-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-05-14 | House | Introduced By Representative Thomas Albert |
Subjects
Occupations: business licensing and registration
Occupations: other
Safety: other
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Occupations: other
Safety: other
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs