MI HB4582 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-28 - Assigned Pa 289'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-28 - Assigned Pa 289'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax; exemptions; tax incentive for use of certain equipment for agricultural purposes; provide for. Amends sec. 9 of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.9).
Title
Property tax; exemptions; tax incentive for use of certain equipment for agricultural purposes; provide for. Amends sec. 9 of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.9).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 770 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 428 (Y: 103 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Agriculture (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 428 (Y: 103 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Agriculture (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-28 | House | Assigned Pa 289'11 With Immediate Effect |
2011-12-28 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/21/2011 @ 2:51 Pm |
2011-12-28 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/19/2011 @ 3:44 Pm |
2011-12-15 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/15/2011 @ 3:05 Pm |
2011-12-13 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2011-12-13 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2011-12-13 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2011-12-13 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2011-12-13 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 770 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2011-12-08 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2011-12-08 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2011-12-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2011-12-08 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-12-08 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2011-10-26 | House | Transmitted |
2011-10-26 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 428 Yeas 103 Nays 5 |
2011-10-26 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-10-25 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-10-25 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2011-10-25 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-09-21 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-09-21 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2011-05-18 | House | Recommendation Concurred In |
2011-05-18 | House | Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Agriculture |
2011-04-27 | House | Printed Bill Filed 04/27/2011 |
2011-04-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2011-04-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-04-26 | House | Introduced By Representative Kevin Daley |