MI HB4577 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-22 - Assigned Pa 162'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-22 - Assigned Pa 162'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Highways: memorial; portion of M-52; designate as the "Michigan Desert Storm Veterans Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2081) by adding sec. 1092.
Title
Highways: memorial; portion of M-52; designate as the "Michigan Desert Storm Veterans Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2081) by adding sec. 1092.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 274 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 41 (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 41 (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-22 | House | Assigned Pa 162'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-09-22 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 09/17/2020 11:54 Am |
2020-09-22 | House | Approved By The Governor 09/17/2020 10:41 Am |
2020-09-09 | House | Presented To The Governor 09/09/2020 01:25 Pm |
2020-09-03 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-09-03 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-09-03 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 274 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-09-01 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-09-01 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2020-02-04 | House | Transmitted |
2020-02-04 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 41 Yeas 104 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 |
2020-02-04 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-01-28 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-01-28 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-01-21 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-12-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2019-05-14 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/14/2019 |
2019-05-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2019-05-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-05-09 | House | Introduced By Representative Ben Frederick |